judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAM ARTHUR BRUYETTE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0250)
Case Number:S-10-0250Case Docketed On:11/24/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:WILLIAM ARTHUR BRUYETTE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:WILLIAM ARTHUR BRUYETTE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWilliam Arthur BruyetteDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Katrina J. Brown

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Evidence
Opinion Number:2011 WY 99
Citation:253 P.3d 512 (Wyo. 2011)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/24/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/24/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/24/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/11/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/11/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/24/2011Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval for Katrina J. Brown, Student Intern, to appear on behalf of appellee.Notice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
02/24/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/25/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Consent and Approval and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/28/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
03/08/2011Notice-Internal - VetoNotice-InternalVetoFinal
03/15/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/21/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
03/21/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volumes II-III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Confidential Folder; Volume V, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/21/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/12/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/21/2011Order - Vacating oral argument and assigning to expedited docketOrderVacating oral argument and assigning to brief only docketFinal
06/24/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/12/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/12/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/15/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/14/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal