judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE VS. DISTRICT COURT (MCANALLY, JR.)

Case Information: 38274
Short Caption:STATE VS. DISTRICT COURT (MCANALLY, JR.)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C158932Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/12/2002How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/06/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/06/2001Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. 01-13199
08/14/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. 01-13796
08/31/2001Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Response of Marcus D. McAnaly, Jr. to the State's Petition for Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative, a Writ of Mandamus. 01-14798
02/12/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral Argument will not be scheduled and this matter shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the papers filed herein. 02-02777
02/12/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP02-CY/DA/ML
03/28/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-05562
04/23/2002RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 02-05728
04/23/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.