judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00932-CR
05-89-00932-CR
08/03/1989
Other Felony
Roy, Bobby Charles
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/03/1990Mandate Issued
08/03/1990Mandate Issued
06/06/1990Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
06/06/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/06/1990Submission
06/06/1990Submitted
06/06/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/06/1990Submission
06/06/1990Submitted
04/11/1990MattConv
03/06/1990Brief Filed
02/13/1990Motion to Supplement Record
02/06/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/05/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/08/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/05/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/11/1989Brief Filed
11/15/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/14/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/06/1989Letter Sent by the Court
10/19/1989Letter Sent by the Court
10/11/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/09/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/06/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
09/21/1989Transcript Filed
08/03/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/31/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/28/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/03/1990Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
283rd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable H. D. Garmon
F89-81898-HT
30 yrs TDC