judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00799-CR
01-89-00799-CR
08/03/1989
Other Drug Possession
Tribble, Karen Ann
Texas, The State of
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/20/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
08/20/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/28/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
07/24/1990Date final opinion release for publication
07/13/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
06/28/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/28/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/06/1990Submitted
06/06/1990Submission
06/06/1990Submitted
03/28/1990Submission
02/01/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
02/01/1990Case ready to be set
02/01/1990Case ready to be set
01/11/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/22/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
12/06/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
12/05/1989Supplemental transcript filed
11/16/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
11/02/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/06/1989Statement of facts filed
10/05/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
10/05/1989Motion to extend time to file transcript dispGrant motion
10/05/1989Transcript filed
09/21/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
09/21/1989Motion to extend time to file transcript
08/03/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/25/1989Notice of appeal filed
07/24/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/20/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasCarol M. Cameron
StateCriminal - State of TexasKelly Siegler
StateAppellantRobert G. Turner
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
Trial Court Information
209th District Court
Harris
508,853
2 yrs tdc probated