judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00730-CR
14-89-00730-CR
08/03/1989
Robbery
Anderson, Angela Shinella
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/12/1990Waiver of remaining time to file briefState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/19/1990Mandate Issued
09/19/1990Mandate Issued
09/10/1990Case stored
09/04/1990No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
08/17/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
08/02/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
08/02/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
08/01/1990Submitted
08/01/1990Submission
08/01/1990Submitted
02/12/1990Case ready to be set
02/12/1990Waiver of remaining time to file brief
02/12/1990Case ready to be set
10/25/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/25/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
09/21/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
09/13/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
09/08/1989No description available.
08/17/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
08/11/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
08/03/1989Transcript FILED
08/03/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/30/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
06/06/1989Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/10/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasMichael J. Guarino
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantRobert E. Hoskins
Trial Court Information
56th District Court
Galveston
88CR1381
10 years