Case Information: 38273 | |||
Short Caption: | DGD DEVELOPMENT VS. INDIAN HILLS GID | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 00CV0217 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Gibbons | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 08/16/2001 / Cobb, William | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | 10/14/2002 at 8:30 AM | Oral Argument Location: | Carson City |
Submission Date: | 10/14/2002 | How Submitted: | After Oral Argument |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/03/2001 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Young. Law firm of Heaton & Doescher. | ||
08/03/2001 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Heaton & Doescher, Ltd.--check no. 5346. | ||
08/03/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 01-13186 | |
08/14/2001 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 01-13861 | |
08/16/2001 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William G. Cobb. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
10/01/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: October 22, 2001. | 01-16494 | |
10/23/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 01-17848 | |
11/08/2001 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 01-18632 | |
11/20/2001 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/24/01. To Court Reporter: Mildred J. Terry. | 01-19466 | |
12/17/2001 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: April 24, 2001. Court Reporter: Mildred Terry. | 01-21260 | |
03/05/2002 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand Delivered - Reno/Carson Messenger. Signed by Scott Heaton. | 02-04024 | |
03/05/2002 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 02-04025 | |
03/06/2002 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Compliance. | 02-04077 | |
04/08/2002 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: 04/05/02. Signed by: Jeffrey K. Rahbeck | 02-06156 | |
05/06/2002 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 05/06/02. Signed by: Scott J. Heaton. | 02-07868 | |
05/06/2002 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Reply Brief. Appellants' Supplemental Appendix. | 02-07869 | |
08/22/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on October 14, 2002, at 8:30 a.m. (NNP03Y-WM/RR/DA) | ||
09/30/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | ||
10/14/2002 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP03Y-WM/RR/DA | ||
01/06/2003 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Gibbons. | ||
02/10/2003 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district ocurt for proceedings consistent wit this order." NNP03Y-WM/RR/DA | 03-02274 | |
03/07/2003 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 03-02292 | |
03/07/2003 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/17/2003 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 11, 2003. | 03-02292 |