judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOSEPH MURRAY V. DC DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SERVS.

Case Information: 10-AA-1445
Short Caption:JOSEPH MURRAY V. DC DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SERVS.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Worker's Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CRB088-10Filed Date:11/23/2010

Opening Event Date:11/23/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/30/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:08/16/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/22/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/26/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
IntervenorPaul Brothers N
Mary G. WeidnerYN
IntervenorSafecoN
Mary G. WeidnerYN
PetitionerJoseph Murray NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.N
Todd S. KimNY
Michael A. MilweeNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/23/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
12/02/2010 ORDERED that petitioner shall within 15 days from the date of this order tender the $100 fee or file a fully completed motion and financial information statement to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC)
12/08/2010NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTERVENE of Paul Brothers & SAFECO
12/15/2010FILING FEE
12/28/2010 ORDERED that the lodged petition for review is filed nunc pro tunc to November 23, 2010. It is F/O that the Administrative Agency shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. (JAC)
12/30/2010RECORD ON APPEAL
12/30/2010RECORD COMPLETED
01/06/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's and intervenor's briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
02/14/2011RECEIVED - pet's motion for ext of time to file brief. (returned for signature on cert of serv)
02/14/2011RECEIVED- petitioner's motion to extend time to file brief (signature needed on certificate of service)
02/16/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo
03/03/2011 On consideration of petitioner's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before April 1, 2011. (JAC)
04/01/2011FiledPETITIONER'S BRIEF (no appdx)
04/12/2011 It appearing that the brief of petitioner, was filed with this court on April 1, 2011, and it further appearing that the appendix was due to be filed on or before April 1, 2011, and has not been filed, (See D.C. App. R. 30, 31.), it is ORDERED that petitioner shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the app endix or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's and intervenor's briefs shall be filed within 30 days from the date the appendix is filed with this court. (JAC)
04/14/2011RECEIVED- intervenor's response in oppo to motion to supplement the record (motion motion to supplement the record filed)
04/26/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE APPENDIX and for leave to correct/supplement the record (Titled as: Supplemental Motion for Leave to correct record)
04/26/2011RECEIVED - Petitioner's Reply to opposition to motion to supplement the record
04/26/2011RECEIVED - Appendix (per TA)
05/06/2011 On consideration of petitioner's motion for leave to correct the record, and the lodged appendix, and intervenor's opposition to the motion to correct the record, the response thereto, it is ORDERED that the Clekr shall file the lodged appendix. It is F/O that petitioner's motion to correct the record is denied. (ETW)
05/06/2011APPENDIX
05/25/2011INTERVENOR'S BRIEF
06/02/2011RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until July 18, 2011
07/06/2011 On consideration of respondent's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that respondent's motion is granted and the brief of respondent shall be filed on or before JULY 18, 2011. (JAC)
07/18/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File until August 16, 2011 Brief (Respondent)
08/08/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File until August 16, 2011 Brief (Respondent)
08/16/2011FiledBrief (Respondent)
08/16/2011FiledBriefing Completed
09/07/2011FiledMotion For Leave to Correct Record (Petitioner)Denied
09/16/2011FiledOpposition to Motion to Supplement the Record (Intervenor Brothers, Intervenor Safeco)
09/23/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
10/05/2011FiledDenied Motion For Leave to Correct Record (Petitioner)
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/22/2012FiledSubmitted To Judges Thompson, Beckwith, Ferren
02/29/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Thompson and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Ferren, Senior Judge.)
03/15/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Petition for Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc to April 12, 2012. Other (Petitioner)Granted
05/03/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting petitioner's motion for an extension of time within which to file a petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc to 5/14/12.
05/14/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing En Banc (Petitioner)Denied
05/21/2012FiledLetter From Intervenor Counsel regarding Non-Service of Filings (Intervenor Safeco)
07/12/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing en banc.
07/26/2012FiledMandate