judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAVID D. MORSE v. UNIVERSITY OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0249)
Case Number:S-10-0249Case Docketed On:11/24/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Administration of the Government (Title 9)
Short Title:DAVID D. MORSE v. UNIVERSITY OF WYOMING
Full Title:DAVID D. MORSE, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. UNIVERSITY OF WYOMING, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDavid D. MorseJoseph Phillip Stengel Jr.
AppelleeUniversity of WyomingBradley Trent Cave
Joanna R. Vilos

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/24/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/24/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/24/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/24/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/12/2011Brief - Failure to file - appellantBriefFailure to file - appellantFinal
01/12/2011Order - Dismiss - want of prosecutionOrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
01/13/2011Notice-Incoming - Other - Received one copy of Appellant's brief, untimely. not filedNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
01/13/2011Event - Rejected Filing. Brief of appellant was due on 1/11/11. It was not electronically filed and case was dismissed. Received only original brief of appellant. Not filed.EventRejected FilingFinal
01/27/2011Petition - ReinstatementPetitionReinstatementFinal
01/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's petition for reinstatement and brief in supportEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/11/2011Response/Objection - Other - Petition for ReinstatementResponse/ObjectionOtherFinal
02/11/2011Event - Hard copies not received - Appellee's response in opposition to petition for reinstatementEventHard copies not receivedFinal
02/23/2011Order - Denying Petition to Reinstate AppealOrderDenyFinal
02/23/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal