judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8935
C-8935
08/04/1989
App Writ of Error
SOUTHWESTERN BELL MEDIA INC.
EMBREE INC. d/b/a J. G. BOYD'S VIDEO & APPLIANCE CENTER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
08/21/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
08/04/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
11/02/1989Record returned to Court of AppealsNO REHEARING FILED
10/11/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
08/23/1989Case forwarded to Court
08/23/1989No description available.
08/21/1989Reply to Response
08/04/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
11/02/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00751-CV
Reversed & Rendered
772 SW2d 209, 05-08-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 1
Dallas
Honorable Michael J. O'Neill
CC87-8351-A