judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-89-00195-CR
09-89-00195-CR
08/04/1989
Misdemeanor DWI
Gwyn, Gradon Gilmer
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/13/1990Mandate Issued
01/29/1990Memorandum to Clerk
01/24/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/25/1989Brief Filed
10/25/1989Case ready to be set
10/19/1989Brief Filed
09/27/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
09/20/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
09/19/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/19/1989Statement of Facts Received
09/18/1989Transcript Filed
08/04/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/04/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/13/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 2
Jefferson
Honorable Harold Plessala
139383
30 days, $350 find & costs