judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8936
C-8936
08/04/1989
Second App Writ Error
NBS SOUTHERN INC.
THE MAIL BOX INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
11/30/1989Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedRespondentON BEHALF OF NBS SOUTHERN, INC.
11/22/1989Motion for RehearingPetitionerON BEHALF OF THE MAIL BOX, INC.
08/23/1989Reply to ResponseRespondentNBS SOUTHERN, INC.
08/17/1989Reply to ResponseRespondentMAILBOX'S REPLY
08/04/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitionerAPP#2 - THE MAIL BOX
08/04/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitionerAPP#1 - NBS SOUTHERN
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
01/26/1990Record returned to Court of AppealsREHEARING OVERRULED
01/24/1990Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruledREHEARING OVERRULED
11/30/1989Motion for Rehearing forwarded
11/30/1989Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedON BEHALF OF NBS SOUTHERN, INC.
11/22/1989Motion for RehearingON BEHALF OF THE MAIL BOX, INC.
11/08/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedAPP.#2 - THE MAIL BOX, INC.
11/08/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedAPP.#1 - NBS SOUTHERN, INC.
08/23/1989Case forwarded to Court
08/23/1989No description available.
08/23/1989Reply to ResponseNBS SOUTHERN, INC.
08/17/1989Reply to ResponseMAILBOX'S REPLY
08/04/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledAPP#1 - NBS SOUTHERN
08/04/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledAPP#2 - THE MAIL BOX
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
01/26/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00867-CV
Reversed & Remanded
772 SW2d 470, 05-10-89
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable GORDON ROWE
Trial Court Information
44th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Candace Tyson
87-4529-B