judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-89-00206-CR
02-89-00206-CR
08/04/1989
Other Drug Possession or Delivery
Henderson, My-Linda
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/25/1989Mandate Issued
10/25/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
10/25/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/19/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
09/20/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
08/14/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/08/1989Extension to File Notice of Appeal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/04/1989Extension to File Notice of Appeal Filed
08/04/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/25/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
271st District Court
Wise
Honorable R. E. Thornton
9195
10 yrs. TDC