judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00797-CR
01-89-00797-CR
08/03/1989
Other Felony
Thomas, Preston
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/12/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/12/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/06/1991Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
05/08/1991Petition for discretionary review disposedRefused
03/06/1991Case file received by higher Court or agency.
03/01/1991Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
02/05/1991Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
12/10/1990Extension to file writ disposedGrant motion
12/08/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
11/23/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
11/08/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/08/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/25/1990Submitted
09/25/1990Submission
09/25/1990Submitted
07/25/1990Submission
03/29/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
03/29/1990Case ready to be set
03/29/1990Case ready to be set
03/15/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
02/27/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
02/02/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
01/11/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/28/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/30/1989Statement of facts filed
11/27/1989Transcript filed
08/03/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/02/1989Notice of appeal filed
08/01/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/12/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StatePRO SE
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - AppellantKenneth W. Smith
Trial Court Information
185th District Court
Harris
Honorable Frank C. Price
528,236
40 yrs tdc