judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1053-89
PD-1053-89
07/18/1989
PDR Case Type
EDWARDS, REHOBOAM
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/20/1989FINAL DISPRefused
10/04/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/18/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/18/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/01/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
EDWARDS, REHOBOAMApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)John H. Hagler
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00364-CR
Aff 5-26-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court 4 of Dallas County
Dallas
Honorable Frances Maloney
F88-77601-SK