judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-89-00347-CV
04-89-00347-CV
07/17/1989
Summary Judgment
Texas Mexican Railway Company
Dana Hellen Minerals, Ltd., Dana L. Hellen, Et Al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/28/1990Mandate Issued
06/28/1990Mandate Issued
06/27/1990Case Returned from Higher Court
05/23/1990Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
04/12/1990Information regarding cause received
03/27/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
03/26/1990Writ of Error filed
03/19/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/26/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
02/14/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/14/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/24/1990Submitted
01/24/1990Submission
01/24/1990Submitted
12/08/1989Submission
09/28/1989Requests Oral Argument
09/28/1989Brief Filed
09/28/1989Case ready to be set
09/28/1989Case ready to be set
09/18/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion Granted in Part
09/06/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
08/14/1989Requests Oral Argument
08/14/1989Order Entered
08/14/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
08/14/1989Brief Filed
08/14/1989Order Entered
08/14/1989Order Entered
08/14/1989Order Entered
08/14/1989Order Entered
08/14/1989Order Entered
07/28/1989No Description Available.
07/28/1989Response to Motion Filed
07/26/1989No Description Available.
07/26/1989No Description Available.
07/21/1989Show cause hearing held
07/17/1989No Description Available.
07/17/1989No Description Available.
07/17/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/23/1989Appeal Bond Filed
04/07/1989Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/28/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
229th Judicial District Court
Jim Hogg
Honorable Ricardo H. Garcia
2507
n/a