judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-89-00247-CR
07-89-00247-CR
07/17/1989
Other Felony
Clement, Billy Wayne
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/27/1989Mandate Issued
08/10/1989Opinion issuedOverruled
08/07/1989Response to any order, inquiry or motion
08/04/1989Motion for leave to file (miscellaneous)GRANT
07/17/1989Mot. to extend time to file notice of appeal disp
07/17/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/27/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
84th District Court
Hutchinson
Honorable Leslie Thomas
1247