judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-89-00230-CV
08-89-00230-CV
07/17/1989
Miscellaneous civil
American Petrofina, Inc.
Sharon Sue Kidwell, Indiv. and as Rep. & Heir of the Est. of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/17/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
09/20/1989Judgment IssuedDismissed
09/20/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/20/1989Mandate Issued
09/20/1989Judgment IssuedDismissed
09/20/1989Mandate Issued
09/20/1989Submission
09/20/1989Submitted
09/20/1989Case ready to be set
09/13/1989Miscellaneous Motion Filed
08/02/1989Motion for Ext Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/02/1989Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/17/1989Fee paid
07/17/1989Fee paid
07/17/1989Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
07/17/1989Motion - Extension to File Transcript filed
07/17/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/17/2011Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellantHon. Richard Bonner
UnknownAppelleeHon. Ruben Sandoval
Trial Court Information
5349