judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-89-00229-CR
08-89-00229-CR
07/17/1989
All Misdemeanors
Davis, Bobby Pat
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/19/1991Mandate Issued
04/19/1991Shuck purged
04/19/1991Mandate Issued
03/27/1991Case Returned from Higher Court
03/27/1991Decision from Supreme Court or CCARefused
11/27/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
11/16/1990Petition for Discretionary Review
10/29/1990Fee paid
10/19/1990Fee paid
10/17/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/17/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/19/1990Motion to Withdraw as appeal atty disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/14/1990Motion to Withdraw as appeal atty filed
09/14/1990Submitted
09/14/1990Submission
09/14/1990Submitted
07/16/1990Submission
05/10/1990Case ready to be set
05/10/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
05/10/1990Case ready to be set
04/23/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
03/21/1990Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/21/1990Notice of Appeal Filed
03/21/1990Order entered
03/21/1990Supplemental Transcript Filed
03/21/1990Case reinstated
03/21/1990Case reinstated
03/05/1990Miscellaneous Motion Filed
02/05/1990Mandate Issued
01/03/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
01/03/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
01/03/1990Submission
01/03/1990Submitted
12/12/1989Submission
11/09/1989Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry
11/04/1989Case ready to be set
11/04/1989Case ready to be set
10/10/1989Brief Filed
10/10/1989Envelope Filed, showing postmark date
09/27/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/11/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
08/09/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/09/1989Transcript Filed
07/17/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/17/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/19/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of TexasHon. Tracey Scown
DAVIS, BOBBY PATCriminal - AppellantHon. Jeff Spain
Trial Court Information
County Court
Ector
V-89-427-A
$200. fine & CC & 6mo jail