judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00839-CR
05-89-00839-CR
07/17/1989
Burglary
Turner, Roger Dale
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/24/2000Record RetentionRetain
07/23/1990Mandate Issued
07/23/1990Mandate Issued
05/23/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/23/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/22/1990Submission
05/22/1990Submitted
05/22/1990Submission
05/22/1990Submitted
03/12/1990MattConv
02/01/1990Case ready to be set
02/01/1990Brief Filed
02/01/1990Case ready to be set
01/22/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/19/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/08/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/04/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/07/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/05/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/07/1989Brief Filed
10/27/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/25/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
10/24/1989Letter issued by the court
10/24/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/20/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
09/19/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
09/05/1989Letter issued by the court
09/05/1989Transcript Filed
07/17/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/17/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/09/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/23/1990Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2
Dallas
Honorable William Black
F89-79071-HI
75 yrs TDC