judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-89-00177-CV
09-89-00177-CV
07/17/1989
Contract
Atchley, Nolan G.
NCNB Texas National Bank, formerly First Republicbank Lufkin
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/04/1991Mandate Issued
12/31/1990Case Returned from Higher Ct.
10/25/1990Petition for WritFiled in Higher Court
10/17/1990Petition for Writ
09/18/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
09/17/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
08/30/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/24/1990Submitted
05/24/1990Submission
03/23/1990Submission
10/17/1989Supplemental Brief Filed
09/29/1989Brief Filed
09/29/1989Case ready to be set
09/08/1989Brief Filed
08/16/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/15/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/17/1989Transcript Filed
07/17/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/04/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ncnb Texas National BankAppelleeJerry L. Atherton
Jerry L. Atherton
Nolan G. AtchleyAppellantBill R. Jones
Trial Court Information
217th District Court
Angelina
Honorable David V. Wilson
22,849-88-07