judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 11-89-00175-CV
11-89-00175-CV
07/17/1989
Miscellaneous civil
In re: J. S. and P.I., Children
-
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/27/1989Mandate issued
08/10/1989Mot. - For rehearing disposed
08/10/1989Mot. - For rehearing disposedOverruled
07/26/1989Mot. - For rehearing filed
07/20/1989Mot. - Ext. on notice of appeal disposedOverruled
07/17/1989Mot. - Ext. on notice of appeal filed
07/17/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/27/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of Texas
IVy, Jewel KayAppellant
Trial Court Information
35th District Court
Brown
87-07-00628