judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00732-CV
01-89-00732-CV
07/17/1989
Contract
J. B. Custom Design and Building, et al
L. W. Clawson and Linda Clawson
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/16/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
09/15/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
09/10/1990Extension of time to file mtn. for rehearing disp.Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
08/31/1990Date final opinion release for publication
08/30/1990Extension of time to file motion for rehearing
08/15/1990Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
06/08/1990Motion for rehearing filed
05/24/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/24/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/10/1990Submitted
04/10/1990Submission
04/10/1990Submitted
02/06/1990Submission
11/28/1989Supplemental brief filed
10/23/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
10/23/1989Case ready to be set
10/23/1989Supplemental transcript filed
10/23/1989Case ready to be set
10/12/1989Motion strans disposedGrant motion
10/12/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
09/28/1989Motion for leave to file strans
09/28/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
09/05/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
08/03/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
08/03/1989Statement of facts filed
07/20/1989Depositons filed
07/20/1989Filing fee paid
07/20/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
07/20/1989Supplemental transcript filed
07/19/1989Filing fee paid
07/17/1989Transcript filed
07/17/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/21/1989Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/16/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppelleeMario L. Vasquez
StateAppellantHon. Anthony D. Gunn
Trial Court Information
157th District Court
Harris
84-52512