judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00731-CR
01-89-00731-CR
07/17/1989
Other Felony
Haley, Richard
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/28/1991Mandate received from CCA or Supreme Court
09/12/1990Petition for discretionary review disposedGrant motion
07/23/1990Case file received by higher Court or agency.
07/20/1990Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
06/22/1990Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
06/06/1990Extension to file writ disposedGrant motion
06/06/1990Extension of time to file mtn. for rehearing disp.Overruled
05/30/1990Extension of time to file motion for rehearing
05/26/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
05/11/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
04/26/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/26/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/20/1990Submitted
03/20/1990Submission
03/20/1990Submitted
01/26/1990Submission
10/20/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
10/20/1989Case ready to be set
10/20/1989Case ready to be set
09/26/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
09/21/1989Motion to supplement record disposedGrant motion
09/21/1989Statement of facts filed
09/07/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
09/05/1989Motion to supplement record
08/23/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/27/1989Statement of facts filed
07/27/1989Transcript filed
07/17/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/07/1989Notice of appeal filed
06/12/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/28/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasJames Kuboviak
StateCriminal - AppellantHon. Henry C. Paine, Jr.
Trial Court Information
County Court
Brazos
329-87
$1500 fn+$90 cst + 180 dys