judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00833-CR
05-89-00833-CR
07/17/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Watkins, Timothy Wayne
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/1990Mandate Issued
06/18/1990Mandate Issued
04/17/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/17/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/02/1990Letter Sent by the Court
03/29/1990Case ready to be set
03/29/1990Case ready to be set
02/16/1990Letter Sent by the Court
12/19/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/18/1989Letter Sent by the Court
12/15/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/22/1989Brief Filed
11/22/1989Case ready to be set
11/01/1989Letter Sent by the Court
10/31/1989Brief Filed
10/02/1989Transcript Filed
09/29/1989Statement of Facts Filed
07/17/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/06/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/05/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
204th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Richard Mays
F89-96155-JQ
35 yrs TDC