Case Information: 10-CF-1446 | |||
Short Caption: | TAVON K. STEWART V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CF2-8482-10 | Filed Date: | 11/24/2010 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 11/24/2010 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 03/15/2011 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 09/28/2011 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 09/13/2012 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 02/07/2013 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Tavon K. Stewart | Y | Pro Se | N | ||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
11/24/2010 | NOTICE OF APPEAL (Amended NOA filed on 11/22/10) | |||
12/03/2010 | On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Thomas D. Engle, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC) | |||
01/03/2011 | STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ORDERED/NEEDED (pii) | |||
01/19/2011 | APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD no oppo | |||
02/25/2011 | ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted to the extent that appellant shall make the necessary arrangement for the transcripts and file a motion to supplement the record with the transcripts in the trial court pursuant to D.C. App. R. 10(e). (ETW) | |||
03/07/2011 | RECORD COPIES | |||
03/07/2011 | RECORD INDEX | |||
03/07/2011 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (SEALED pleadings) | |||
03/15/2011 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (83 pgs/Hamilton) 7/29/10 proc. | |||
03/15/2011 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (113 pgs/Van Bremen) 8/2/10 proc. | |||
03/15/2011 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (207 pgs/Shelton) 8/3/10 proc. | |||
03/15/2011 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (129 pgs/Swaringer) 8/4/10 proc. | |||
03/15/2011 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (107 pgs/Swaringer) 8/5/10 proc. | |||
03/15/2011 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (22 pgs/Swaringer) 8/6/10 proc. w/cd | |||
03/15/2011 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
03/17/2011 | It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo) | |||
04/26/2011 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 8/23/11 | |||
05/05/2011 | On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before August 23, 2011. (JAC) | |||
06/02/2011 | APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION ex parte, for issuance of an expert voucher for prepartion of trancsript of telephone calls. | |||
06/27/2011 | Filed | ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION IS GRANTED and an EXPERT VOUCHER shall issue to allow for the transcription of appellant's videotaped statement. It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL NOTIFY THIS COURT W/N 15 DAYS FROM RECEIPT OF THE 911 TRANSCRIPT and that upon notification a NEW BRIEFING ORDER SHALL ISSUE. (BY: ETW) LW | ||
07/27/2011 | Filed | Motion To Supplement The Record (Appellant) | ||
08/02/2011 | Filed | Answer/Response - to Court's order of 6/27/11 stating counsel is in receipt of transcript (Appellant) | ||
08/15/2011 | Filed | Order Granting Appellant's motion to supplement the record. | ||
08/18/2011 | Filed | Supplemental Record specify - #8 (transcript of videotaped statement) | ||
08/23/2011 | Filed | Brief (Appellant) | ||
08/23/2011 | Filed | Appendix (Appellant) | ||
09/22/2011 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) | ||
09/28/2011 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the lodged brief. | ||
09/28/2011 | Filed | Brief (Appellee) | ||
09/28/2011 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
06/26/2012 | Filed | ACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary | ||
07/26/2012 | Filed | ACTION - Calendar notice sent | ||
09/13/2012 | Filed | Submitted To Judge Beckwith,Oberly,Terry | ||
01/16/2013 | Filed | Affirmed (MOJ) (Oberly and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Terry, Senior Judge.) | ||
02/07/2013 | Filed | Mandate | ||
02/12/2013 | Filed | Qualls Letter Filed (Appellant) |