judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAVID K. STONE and NICHOLAS B. LOUNDAGIN v. DEVON ENERGY PRODUCTION COMPANY, L.P., and CARPENTER & SONS, INC.

Case Heading (S-08-0267)
Case Number:S-08-0267Case Docketed On:12/12/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Johnson CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Mines and Minerals (Title 30)
Short Title:DAVID K. STONE and NICHOLAS B. LOUNDAGIN v. DEVON ENERGY PRODUCTION COMPANY, L.P., and CARPENTER & SONS, INC.
Full Title:DAVID K. STONE and NICHOLAS B. LOUNDAGIN, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. DEVON ENERGY PRODUCTION COMPANY, L.P., and CARPENTER & SONS, INC., Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDavid K. StoneStephen R. Winship
AppellantNicholas B. LoundaginStephen R. Winship
AppelleeDevon Energy Production Company, L.P.Scott P. Klosterman
AppelleeCarpenter & Sons, Inc.Scott P. Klosterman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Property
Opinion Number:2009 WY 114
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/12/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/12/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/12/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/12/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/06/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/07/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' Brief and received copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/24/2009Event - Rejected Filing - brief of appellee as untimely.EventRejected FilingFinal
02/24/2009Motion - Accept late filingMotionAccept late filingFinal
03/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Leave to File Brief of Appellees and Attached Appendix (Untimely, due 02/27/09)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/24/2009Order - Granting Motion for Leave to File Brief of AppelleesOrderGrantFinal
03/26/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/30/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellees (Pages 44 & 45 replaced to reflect actual filing date)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/08/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/13/2009Brief - Appellant ReplyBriefAppellantFinal
04/14/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/14/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/16/2009Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
04/20/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Joint motion to vacate and reschedule oral argument setting.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/20/2009Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
04/21/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
04/21/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/21/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/12/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Scott Kosterman for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/15/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Stephen Winship for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/18/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Stephen Winship for appellants; Scott Klosterman for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/18/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
07/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
07/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of additional authorityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/15/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/30/2009Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
10/05/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Petition for RehearingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/13/2009Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
10/14/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/14/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/14/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/16/2009Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
01/19/2010Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court, Writ of Certiorari filedNotice-IncomingU.S. Supreme CourtFinal
04/23/2010Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Other Petition for Writ of Certiorari denied by U.S. Supreme CourtRulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal