judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SCHMERLER VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 38265
Short Caption:SCHMERLER VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0103982Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/02/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
08/02/2001MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Emergency Motion for Immediate Stay of Proceedings Before Nevada State Board of Medical Examiners Pending Determination of Extraordinary Writ. 01-13121
08/06/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Withdrawal of Emergency Motion for Immediate Stay of Proceedings. 01-13239
08/15/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days.
08/21/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Lemons Grundy & Eisenberg--check no. 31137.
08/28/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order to Administratively Close Docket. On August 2, 2001, petitioner filed an emergency motion for a stay of proceedings before the Nevada State Board of Medical Examiners. On August 6, 2001, petitioner filed a notice of withdrawal of the emergency motion. Petitioner represents that he will not be filing a petition for a writ of mandamus as indicated in the August 2, 2001, emergency motion for a stay, and that no further action will be taken in this matter. We direct the clerk of this court to administratively close this proceeding. 01-14545
08/28/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. (Administratively closed.) No remittitur issued.