judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

W. P. MITCHELL, ET AL. v. CARROLL INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, ET AL.

Case: B-1322
B-1322
01/16/1969
Application for Writ of Error
W. P. MITCHELL, ET AL.
CARROLL INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/19/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/27/1969Supplement to Petition filedPetitioner
02/24/1969Response to Brief filedRespondent
02/20/1969Errata FiledRespondent
02/20/1969Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
01/31/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
01/16/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/24/1969Response to Motion filed
03/19/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/27/1969Supplement to Petition filed
02/24/1969Response to Brief filed
02/20/1969Errata Filed
02/20/1969Supplemental Brief filed
01/31/1969Response to Petition
01/16/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/16/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. P. Mitchell, et al.Petitioner
Carroll Independent School District, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information