judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-89-00346-CV
04-89-00346-CV
07/17/1989
Miscellaneous civil
City of San Antonio & David Alonzo
Allen Dunn & Sarah Dunn
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/31/1991Original Exhibits Returned
05/30/1991Mandate Issued
05/30/1991Mandate Issued
05/14/1991Case Returned from Higher Court
05/08/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
02/27/1991Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
11/06/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
11/05/1990Writ of Error filed
11/02/1990Writ of Error filed
10/04/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/04/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/30/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
08/30/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
08/15/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed/Reversed & Rendered
08/15/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed/Reversed & Rendered
01/23/1990Submitted
01/23/1990Submission
01/23/1990Submitted
01/16/1990Reply brief filed
12/08/1989Submission
11/29/1989Case ready to be set
11/29/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/29/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/29/1989Case ready to be set
11/21/1989Brief Filed
11/21/1989Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
11/21/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
11/21/1989Requests Oral Argument
10/24/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/24/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/23/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
10/10/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/06/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
09/27/1989Motion DisposedMotion or Writ No Action Taken
09/26/1989Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/19/1989Verification Filed
09/18/1989No New Event but Update in Calendar
09/18/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/18/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/15/1989Motion Filed
09/13/1989Motion Filed
09/13/1989Requests Oral Argument
09/13/1989Brief Filed
09/13/1989Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
09/06/1989Requests Oral Argument
09/06/1989Brief Filed
09/06/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
08/24/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/23/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
08/23/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/22/1989Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
07/24/1989Exhibits Filed
07/24/1989No Description Available.
07/17/1989No Description Available.
07/17/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/21/1989Appeal Bond Filed
05/16/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
03/31/1989Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/30/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
288th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Raul Rivera
86-CI-12312
n/a