judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00835-CR
05-89-00835-CR
07/17/1989
Burglary
Durham, Robert Lee
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/24/1990Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
09/24/1990Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
05/18/1990Case ready to be set
05/18/1990Brief Filed
05/18/1990Case ready to be set
05/17/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/15/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/02/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/30/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/02/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/30/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/07/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/05/1990Brief Filed
03/05/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/15/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/10/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/13/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
12/08/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
12/08/1989Statement of Facts Filed
11/16/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Denied
11/15/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
10/06/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/05/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
10/03/1989Letter Sent by the Court
08/31/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/30/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
08/28/1989Letter Sent by the Court
08/24/1989Transcript Filed
07/17/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/26/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/26/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/24/1990Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2
Dallas
Honorable Larry W Baraka
F89-96694-RI
30 yrs TDC