judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8871
C-8871
07/18/1989
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
JAMES W. SULLIVAN
THE HONORABLE DAN GIBBS JUDGE ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
10/05/1989Case StoredNO REHEARING FILED
09/13/1989M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedOverruled
07/18/1989Exhibits receivedTWO VOLUMES
07/18/1989Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
07/18/1989No description available.
07/18/1989Petition for writ received
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
10/05/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sullivan, Katharine J.Other interested party Ms. Katharine J. Sullivan
Court of Appeals Information:
05-89-00820-CV
Denied
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
255th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dan Gibbs
84-16430-S