judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00726-CR
01-89-00726-CR
07/17/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Harris, Donald Edward
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/28/1991Mandate issued
01/05/1991No petition for review or writ of error was filed
12/21/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
12/06/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/06/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/04/1990Submitted
10/04/1990Submission
10/04/1990Submitted
09/07/1990Submission
01/18/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
01/18/1990Case ready to be set
01/18/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
01/18/1990Case ready to be set
01/05/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
12/14/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/04/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/09/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
11/09/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
10/30/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/02/1989Statement of facts filed
09/14/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
08/30/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
08/03/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
07/18/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
07/17/1989Transcript filed
07/17/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/05/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/28/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - AppellantRobert Penrice
StateCriminal - State of TexasMichael J. Guarino
StateCriminal - State of TexasThomas Rodriguez
Trial Court Information
212th District Court
Galveston
Honorable ISRAEL LERNER
88CR0735
30 Years