judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1058-89
PD-1058-89
07/18/1989
PDR Case Type
SCHINDLER, WAYNE THOMAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/10/1989FINAL DISPRefused
10/25/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/18/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/18/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/20/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
SCHINDLER, WAYNE THOMASApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Gary A. Udashen
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00182-CR
Aff 5-9-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
195th District Court
Dallas
Honorable JOE KENDALL
F87-90580-KN