judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8872
C-8872
07/18/1989
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
BUFFORD MCDONALD
THE HONORABLE ELISHA DEMERSON, JUDGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/05/1989Case StoredNO REHEARING FILED
09/15/1989Letter FiledFR/RELATOR REQ. EMERGENCY ACTION - SHOULD HAVE CROSSED IN THE MAIL W/OUR LETTER NOTICE OF 9/13/89 - EVT.#5.
09/13/1989M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedOverruled
08/11/1989Letter ReceivedLETTER FROM MR. MCDONALD IN RE: EXHIBITS IN COA
07/18/1989Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
07/18/1989No description available.
07/18/1989Petition for writ received
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
10/05/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
07-89-00178-CV
Denied
7th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 1
Potter