judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00838-CR
05-89-00838-CR
07/17/1989
Other Felony
Bowers, Connie Beth
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/02/2020Order enteredDestroy
10/24/2000Record RetentionDestroy
05/21/1990Mandate Issued
05/21/1990Mandate Issued
03/21/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/21/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/20/1990Submission
03/20/1990Submitted
03/20/1990Submission
03/20/1990Submitted
01/25/1990MattConv
12/22/1989Brief Filed
12/22/1989Case ready to be set
12/22/1989Case ready to be set
12/11/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/07/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/28/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/22/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/26/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/23/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/28/1989Brief Filed
09/01/1989Transcript Filed
08/31/1989Statement of Facts Filed
07/17/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/30/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
05/08/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/02/2020Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
204th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Richard Mays
F88-78339-SQ
3 yrs TDC