judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-89-00161-CV
02-89-00161-CV
07/17/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Cornish, William Ross
Cornish, Robbie Miller
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/10/1989Case stored
09/20/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
08/22/1989Letter
08/03/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
07/17/1989Extension to File Bond Filed for Original Proceed
07/17/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/10/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
360th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Ira Sam Houston
360-37826