judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-6453
B-6453
02/22/1976
Application for Writ of Error
FROST NATIONAL BANK OF SAN ANTONIO, INDEPENDENT EXECUTOR AND TRUSTEE OF ESTATE OF LOUISE M. COZBY, DECEASED
KAROLEN NEWTON AND LOUISE PURVIS, ET AL., KAROLEN WILKINSON DITTMAR
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/07/1977Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/06/1977Response to PetitionRespondent
01/05/1977Response to PetitionRespondent
12/22/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/22/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/25/1977Letter Filed
07/13/1977Response to Motion filed
07/07/1977Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/22/1977Dissenting opinion issued.
06/22/1977Opinion issued
02/16/1977Document received (See Remarks)
02/16/1977Document received (See Remarks)
02/16/1977Document received (See Remarks)
02/16/1977Document received (See Remarks)
02/16/1977Document received (See Remarks)
02/16/1977Document received (See Remarks)
02/16/1977Document received (See Remarks)
01/06/1977Response to Petition
01/05/1977Response to Petition
12/22/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/22/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/22/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Karolen Newton and Louise Purvis, et al.Respondent
Karolen Wilkinson DittmarRespondent
Frost National Bank of San Antonio, Independent Executor and Trustee of Estate of Louise M. Cozby, deceasedPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information