Case Information: 64086 | |||
Short Caption: | CRABB VS. GREENSPUN MEDIA GROUP | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 71443 , 71443-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A653286 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 12/11/2013 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/25/2013 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. | ||
09/25/2013 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. Filed certified copy of proper person notice of appeal. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 13-28603 | |
09/26/2013 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Tawanna K. Crabb. Check no. 1069. | ||
10/02/2013 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter Cheryl Carpenter stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 5/30/13. | 13-29340 | |
10/16/2013 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form (Addressed to Court Reporter Cheryl Carpenter). | 13-30935 | |
10/16/2013 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form (Addressed to Court Reporter Richard Kangas). | 13-30936 | |
11/07/2013 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant shall have until November 12, 2013, to file and serve the civil proper person appeal statement. | 13-33495 | |
11/15/2013 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 13-34454 | |
12/05/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 15 days. | 13-36602 | |
12/11/2013 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Vol. I. | 13-37388 | |
12/11/2013 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
05/07/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Response. Respondent's response (10 pages) due: 30 days. | 14-14696 | |
06/06/2014 | Brief | Filed Respondents Greenspun Media Group, LLC and Las Vegas Sun, Inc.'s Response to Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 14-18552 | |
06/06/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents Greenspun Media Group, LLC and Las Vegas Sun, Inc.'s Joinder to Dana Gentry and Jon Ralston's Response to Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 14-18553 | |
06/09/2014 | Brief | Filed Defendant-Respondents Dana Gentry and Jon Ralston's Response to Plaintiff-Appellant Tawanna K. Crabb's Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 14-18602 | |
06/09/2014 | Appendix | Filed Appendix Defendant-Respondents Dana Gentry and Jon Ralston's Response to Plaintiff-Appellant Tawanna K. Crabb's Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement | 14-18603 | |
07/22/2014 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Supplemental Appendix. (Poper Person) | 14-23798 | |
07/23/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Firm for Counsel. Respondent counsel Craig Newman is now with the firm Durham Jones & Pinegar. | 14-23964 | |
09/16/2014 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "We therefore reverse the district court's order dismissing appellant's false light, emotional distress, and negligence claims and remand this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order. We affirm, however, the portion of the district court's order dismissing appellant's defamation and slander per se claims." SNP14-JH/MD/MC | 14-30667 | |
09/23/2014 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Defendant-Respondents Dana Gentry and Jon Ralston's Petition for Rehearing. | 14-31573 | |
09/23/2014 | Filing Fee | Filing fee on rehearing paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Philip R. Erwin | ||
10/03/2014 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing - Respondents Greenspun Media Group, LLC and Las Vegas Sun, Inc.'s Joinder to Dana Gentry and Jon Ralston's Petition for Rehearing. | 14-33006 | |
10/03/2014 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Craig S. Newman | ||
10/29/2014 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). | 14-35981 | |
11/24/2014 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 14-38577 | |
11/24/2014 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
12/04/2014 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 26, 2014. | 14-38577 |