judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-5846
B-5846
02/25/1976
Application for Writ of Error
FRANK WERTZ
JERRY DALE REEVES, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/16/1976Brief on the MeritsRespondent
03/16/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
02/25/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/21/1976Document received (See Remarks)
04/21/1976Document received (See Remarks)
04/21/1976Document received (See Remarks)
04/19/1976Motion to dismissFiling granted
03/16/1976Brief on the Merits
03/16/1976Response to Petition
02/27/1976Miscellaneous Motion
02/25/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/25/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jerry Dale Reeves, et al.Respondent
Frank WertzPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information