judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-5861
B-5861
03/05/1976
Application for Writ of Error
LOUISE MUELLER, WIDOW OF CARL MUELLER, DECEASED
CHARTER OAK FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/24/1976Reply to ResponsePetitioner
06/04/1976Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/19/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
03/05/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/24/1976Reply to Response
06/23/1976Response to Motion filed
06/04/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/19/1976Response to Petition
03/17/1976Extension of time to file app writ err filed
03/05/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/05/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Charter Oak Fire Insurance CompanyRespondent
Louise Mueller, Widow of Carl Mueller, deceasedPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information