judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-7361
B-7361
03/10/1976
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
ALLEN L. LAMAR AND OLLIE JAMES JONES
HON. JOHN L. HILL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/10/1978Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/10/1978Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
03/10/1978Affidavit filed
02/07/1978Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusOverruled
01/17/1978Miscellaneous Motion
03/19/1976Response to Motion filed
03/10/1976Affidavit filed
03/10/1976Affidavit filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hon. John L. HillRespondent
Allen L. Lamar and Ollie James JonesPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information