judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-1300
B-1300
01/07/1969
Application for Writ of Error
MERCANTILE NATIONAL BANK AT DALLAS, FORT WORTH NATIONAL BANK
ELECTRICAL SUPPLY CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/11/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/06/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/27/1969Reply to ResponsePetitioner
01/21/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
01/07/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
01/07/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/19/1969Response to Motion filed
03/11/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/06/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/27/1969Reply to Response
01/21/1969Response to Petition
01/07/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/07/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/07/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Electrical Supply CorporationRespondent
Fort Worth National BankPetitioner
Mercantile National Bank at DallasPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information