judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GRAFF (RICHARD) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 38285
Short Caption:GRAFF (RICHARD) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38507
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - CVHC995832Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/08/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. 12/06/01 ORDER: TRANSFERRED ORIGINAL FROM DOCKET NO. 38285 TO DOCKET NO. 38507.
08/08/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 12/06/01 ORDER: TRANSFERRED ORIGINAL FROM DOCKET NO. 38285 TO DOCKET NO. 38507. 01-13423
10/16/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Entry Written Judgment or Order. Order due from the district court: 30 days. 12/06/01 ORDER: TRANSFERRED ORIGINAL FROM DOCKET NO. 38285 TO DOCKET NO. 38507. 01-17465
10/29/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Order Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed in district court on 8/16/01. 12/06/01 ORDER: TRANSFERRED ORIGINAL FROM DOCKET NO. 38285 TO DOCKET NO. 38507. 01-18129
11/27/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This appeal is governed by Nevada Rule of Appellate Procedure 3C. It appears that appellant was represented by Jeffrey Kump during the lower court proceedings. Therefore, Mr. Kump is hereby ordered to comply with NRAP 3C and, within 10 days from the date of this order file a transcript request form or a certificate stating that no transcript is required in this appeal. fn1[If transcripts have already been prepared and are on file in the district court, the parties may include such transcripts in the appendix without filing a transcript request form.] Mr. Kump shall file a fast track statement within 40 days of this order. Thereafter, this appeal shall proceed in accordance with the provisions of NRAP 3C. 12/06/01 ORDER: TRANSFERRED ORIGINAL FROM DOCKET NO. 38285 TO DOCKET NO. 38507. 01-19840
12/06/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order to Administratively Close Docket. On August 3, 2001, appellant filed a proper person notice of appeal. Because counsel for appellant filed a second notice of appeal from the district court's order on September 14, 2001, the clerk of this court inadvertently opened two separate cases, docket Nos. 38285 and 38507. We direct the clerk of this court administratively to close Docket No. 38285. The clerk of this court shall transfer to Docket No. 38507 all documents filed or received in Docket No. 38285. This appeal shall proceed under Docket No. 38507. 01-20441
12/06/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. Administratively closed. No remittitur issued.