judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-94-00332-CR
14-94-00332-CR
04/07/1994
Robbery
Garrett, Kendrick Laron
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/19/1996Case stored
04/15/1996Mandate due to be issued
04/15/1996Mandate Issued
04/15/1996Mandate Issued
04/02/1996No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
04/01/1996Petition for discretionary review due
03/15/1996Motion for rehearing DUE
02/29/1996Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
02/29/1996Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
02/14/1996Submitted
02/14/1996Submission
02/14/1996Submitted
01/17/1996Submission
09/02/1994Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/02/1994Case ready to be set
09/02/1994Case ready to be set
09/01/1994Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/01/1994Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
09/01/1994Motion to consolidate DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
08/22/1994Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA
08/22/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/22/1994Motion to consolidate FILED-ANT,APE,APP
08/08/1994Past due brief
07/21/1994Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
07/13/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
07/11/1994Past due brief
06/03/1994Record Filed (Both records FILED)
06/03/1994Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
04/07/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/06/1994Date of Sentence
04/06/1994Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/15/1996Case StoredCase stored
07/13/2017Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasRikke Burke Graber
GARRETT, KENDRICK LARONCriminal - AppellantJo Katherine D'Ambrosio
Trial Court Information
338th District Court
Harris
671379
45 yrs. TDC & $2000 fine