judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0364-94
PD-0364-94
04/07/1994
PDR Case Type
DUPEE, JAMES A.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/01/1994FINAL DISPRefused
06/15/1994PDR DISPRefused
06/15/1994PDR DISPRefused
05/10/1994NO RESPONSE FILED
04/07/1994PDR FILED
04/07/1994PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/12/1994STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
Dupee, James A.Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Hal E. Turley
Court of Appeals Information:
05-91-01566-CR
AFF 2-23-94
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court of Dallas County
Dallas
Honorable CLYDE WHITESIDE
F90-55966-TH