judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-94-00336-CR
14-94-00336-CR
04/07/1994
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Heyser, James Justin
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/09/1996Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk
08/13/1996Case stored
08/05/1996Mandate due to be issued
08/05/1996Mandate Issued
08/05/1996Mandate Issued
07/23/1996No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
07/22/1996Petition for discretionary review due
07/10/1996No motion for rehearing FILED
07/05/1996Motion for rehearing DUE
06/20/1996Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
06/20/1996Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
05/01/1996Submitted
05/01/1996Submission
05/01/1996Submitted
03/21/1996Submission
04/13/1995Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
04/13/1995Case ready to be set
04/13/1995Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
04/13/1995Case ready to be set
04/04/1995Brf.RECD.No Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA,
04/04/1995Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/30/1995State's brief DUE
03/09/1995Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
02/28/1995Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
02/02/1995Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/26/1995Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/26/1995State's brief DUE
12/29/1994Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/29/1994Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
12/29/1994No description available.
12/27/1994Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA
12/22/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/28/1994Exhibits FILED
10/27/1994Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
10/26/1994No description available.
10/17/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/13/1994Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
10/13/1994Mtn.supplement record DISPOSED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STAGRANTED
10/13/1994Order Entered
10/06/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/22/1994Mtn.to supplement record FILED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STA
08/25/1994Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
08/22/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/16/1994Past due brief
07/21/1994Motion to consolidate DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
07/15/1994Motion to consolidate FILED-ANT,APE,APP
07/14/1994Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
07/14/1994Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
07/08/1994Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
06/27/1994Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
06/01/1994No description available.
05/31/1994Transcript FILED
04/07/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/04/1994Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
03/31/1994Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/18/2017Case StoredCase archived
08/05/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasErnest Davila
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantTom Moran
Trial Court Information
178th District Court
Harris
677817
25 yrs. TDC