judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-94-00355-CR
14-94-00355-CR
04/07/1994
All Misdemeanors
Wilson, Daniel Ray
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/15/1994Case stored
06/15/1994Mandate Issued
06/15/1994Mandate Issued
05/31/1994No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
05/13/1994No motion for rehearing FILED
04/28/1994Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPDENIED
04/28/1994Misc motion DISPOSEDDENIED
04/28/1994Opinion issuedDISMISSED
04/28/1994Opinion issuedDISMISSED
04/19/1994Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
04/19/1994Misc Motion filed
04/07/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appealsGRANTED
04/07/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/15/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantStephen Christopher Taylor
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes, Jr.
Trial Court Information
178th District Court
Harris
94-01562
6 months HCJ