judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0363-94
PD-0363-94
04/07/1994
PDR Case Type
SANDERSON, RONALD GLENN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/01/1994FINAL DISPRefused
06/15/1994PDR DISPRefused
06/15/1994PDR DISPRefused
05/10/1994NO RESPONSE FILED
04/07/1994PDR FILED
04/07/1994PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/12/1994STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
SANDERSON, EX PARTE RONALD GLEApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Nancy B. Barohn
STATE OF TEXASStateSam Oatman
Court of Appeals Information:
03-93-00380-CR
REV & REM 11-10-93
3rd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
33rd District Court
San Saba
Honorable Clayton E. Evans
4868