judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-94-00169-CV
13-94-00169-CV
04/07/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Hauser, Bill Oliver, Individually and as Trustee, Etco, Incorporated, Bruce Nacci, and Sterling M. Morris
Evins, Joe B. and wife, Lila Evins
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/13/1994Mandate Issued
10/07/1994Additional Copies of Misc. Motion
10/06/1994Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/06/1994Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/06/1994Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
10/04/1994Miscellaneous Motion
09/16/1994Miscellaneous Motion
06/06/1994Brief Filed
06/06/1994Oral argument requested
06/01/1994Green card in
05/31/1994Letter filed
05/25/1994Green card in
05/24/1994Green card in
05/23/1994Green card in
05/23/1994Letter filed
05/09/1994Brief Filed
05/09/1994Case ready to be set
05/09/1994Oral argument requested
05/04/1994Information requested by the court
04/25/1994Statement Filed
04/20/1994Statement Filed
04/07/1994Filing Fee Paid
04/07/1994Transcript Filed
04/07/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/06/1994Statement of Facts Filed
04/06/1994Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
04/06/1994Statement of Facts Received
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/13/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hauser, Bill Oliver IndividuaAppellantGlenn Grossenbacher
Hon. Frank E. Weathered
Hon. Rollin L. Fischer
Evins, Joe B. And Wife Lila EAppelleeM. Steven Deck
John Robert King
Gary E. Ellison
Charles C. Murray
Lisa D. Powell
Trial Court Information
332nd District Court
Hidalgo
Honorable Mario Efrain Ramirez
C-3058-93-F