judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0366-94
PD-0366-94
04/07/1994
PDR Case Type
WILLIAMS, JOHNNIE PAUL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/01/1994FINAL DISPRefused
06/15/1994PDR DISPRefused
06/15/1994PDR DISPRefused
05/10/1994NO RESPONSE FILED
04/07/1994PDR FILED
04/07/1994PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/12/1994STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
WILLIAMS, JOHNNIE PAULApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Kerry P. Fitzgerald
Court of Appeals Information:
05-93-00251-CR
AFF 2-24-94
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
291st District Court
Dallas
Honorable GARY STEPHENS
F92-71410-U